We use cookies to personalise content and ads, to provide social media features and to analyse our traffic. We also share information about your use of our site with our social media, advertising and analytics partners.More informationAgree
menu ×
Google
Custom Search
cancel
search
FacebookTwitterLinkedIn×
share
page location
×
ad

Direct Multiplication (Speed Math)

This method can be used to multiply any two numbers. (Note: speed math calculator can be used to practise problems using this method.)

Example: Calculate 24 × 32

2432
 8

4×2 = 8. Write 8.

2432
 carry=168

3×4 + 2×2 = 16. Write 6 and take 1 as carry.

2432
768

2×3 = 6. 6 plus carried 1 is 7. Write 7.

Answer = 768

Example: Calculate 38 × 67

3867
 carry=56

8×7 = 56. Write 6 and take 5 as carry.

3867
 carry=746

6×8 + 3×7 = 69. 69 plus carried 5 is 74. Write 4 and take 7 as carry.

3867
2546

3×6 = 18. 18 plus carried 7 is 25. Write 25.

Answer = 2546

Example: Calculate 246 × 567

246567
 carry=42

6×7 = 42. Write 2 and take 4 as carry.

246567
 carry=682

6×6 + 4×7 = 64. 64 plus carried 4 is 68. Write 8 and take 6 as carry.

246567
 carry=7482

5×6 + 2×7 + 4×6 = 68. 68 plus carried 6 is 74. Write 4 and take 7 as carry.

246567
 carry=39482

5×4 + 2×6 = 32. 32 plus carried 7 is 39. Write 9 and take 3 as carry.

246567
139482

2×5 = 10. 10 plus carried 3 is 13. Write 13.

Answer = 139482

Example: Calculate 223 × 21

223021
 3

3×1 = 3. Write 3.

223021
 83

2×3 + 2×1 = 8. Write 8.

223021
 683

0×3 + 2×1 + 2×2 = 6. Write 6.

223021
 4683

0×2 + 2×2 = 4. Write 4.

223021
04683

2×0 = 0. Write 0.

Answer = 4683

Example: Calculate 2313 × 3242

23133242
 6

3×2 = 6. Write 6.

23133242
 carry=146

4×3 + 1×2 = 14. Write 4 and take 1 as carry.

23133242
 carry=1746

2×3 + 3×2 + 1×4 = 16. 16 plus carried 1 is 17. Write 7 and take 1 as carry.

23133242
 carry=28746

3×3 + 2×2 + 2×1 + 3×4 = 27. 27 plus carried 1 is 28. Write 8 and take 2 as carry.

23133242
 carry=198746

3×1 + 2×4 + 3×2 = 17. 17 plus carried 2 is 19. Write 9 and take 1 as carry.

23133242
 carry=1498746

3×3 + 2×2 = 13. 13 plus carried 1 is 14. Write 4 and take 1 as carry.

23133242
7498746

2×3 = 6. 6 plus carried 1 is 7. Write 7.

Answer = 7498746

Add Your Comment

(use Q&A for new questions)
?
Name
cancel
preview