We use cookies to personalise content and ads, to provide social media features and to analyse our traffic. We also share information about your use of our site with our social media, advertising and analytics partners.More informationAgree ×  Custom Search
cancel   ×

# Multiplication by Nines (Speed Math)

This method can be used to multiply any number by $99, 999,$ etc. It can be divided into three cases, as explained below. (Note: speed math calculator can be used to practise problems using this method.)

## Case 1: Number of Digits < Number of Nines

### Example: Calculate 18 × 999

Number of digits in $18$ is less than number of digits in $999.$ Hence, write $18$ as $018$ by making number of digits equal. Subtract $1$ from $018$ to obtain left side of answer.

$018 - 1 = 017$

Subtract each digit of $017$ from $9$ to obtain right side of answer.

$9 - 0 = 9, 9 - 1 = 8, 9 - 7 = 2.$ That is, $982.$

Combine left and right sides, that is, $017$ and $982$

Answer $= 017982$

### Example: Calculate 758 × 99999

Number of digits in $758$ is less than number of digits in $99999.$ Hence, write $758$ as $00758$ by making number of digits equal. Subtract $1$ from $00758$ to obtain left side of answer.

$00758 - 1 = 00757$

Subtract each digit of $00757$ from $9$ to obtain right side of answer.

$9 - 0 = 9, 9 - 0 = 9, 9 - 7 = 2, 9 - 5 = 4, 9 - 7 = 2.$ That is, $99242.$

Combine left and right sides, that is, $00757$ and $99242$

Answer $= 0075799242$

## Case 2: Number of Digits = Number of Nines

### Example: Calculate 24 × 99

Subtract $1$ from $24$ to obtain left side of answer.

$24 - 1 = 23$

Subtract each digit of $23$ from $9$ to obtain right side of answer.

$9 - 2 = 7, 9 - 3 = 6.$ That is, $76.$

Combine left and right sides, that is, $23$ and $76$

Answer $=2376$

### Example: Calculate 2358 × 9999

Subtract $1$ from $2358$ to obtain left side of answer.

$2358 - 1 = 2357$

Subtract each digit of $2357$ from $9$ to obtain right side of answer.

$9 - 2 = 7, 9 - 3 = 6, 9 - 5 = 4, 9 - 7 = 2.$ That is, $7642.$

Combine left and right sides, that is, $2357$ and $7642$

Answer $= 23577642$

## Case 3: Number of Digits > Number of Nines

### Example: Calculate 897 × 99

$897 × 99 = 897(100 - 1) = 89700 - 897 = 88803$

### Example: Calculate 23683 × 999

$23683 × 999 = 23683(1000 - 1) = 23683000 - 23683 = 23659317$ Deepak
2014-10-16 13:32:35
Great but its trick doesn't follow $(45879×999=?)$ this type simplification 0 0 reply Aniket
2015-11-19 12:29:06
best way is $45879(1000-1)$ 0 0 Raj
2014-07-10 19:33:34

How to do this $12158×999$

Bz, $12158-1=12157$
$99999-12157=87842$

Here, right Answer is $12145842,$ where center value $45$ How to get in answer? 0 0 reply s
2015-02-11 10:12:09
When number of 9s are less than number of digit in other number The method is slightly different

here 12158*999 .It has 3 9's and other number has 5 digit

So divide the other number in to two group from right .Where right most group contain as much digit as number of 9s

that is 12158 to 2 group 12 and 158(because 3 9's)
then add 1 to the left group 12+1=13
now subtract this number from original number : 12158 - 13 = 12145

now take right most group 158 subtract it form 999+1 : 1000 - 158 = 842

So the result is combine this group 12145842

example 2

45612*999

45 and 612
45+1=46

45612 - 46 = 45566 => 1
1000 - 612 = 388 => 2

combine 1 and 2 => 45566388

example 3

4214*999

4 and 214

4214 - 5 = 4209
1000 - 214 = 786

so answer is 4209786 0 0 Anuradha
2014-07-14 20:28:46

I don't think this method can be used for problems like $12158×999$ where number of digits > number of $9\text{s}$

One method for such cases is $12158×999=12158(1000-1)=12158000-12158=12145842$ 0 0 Maruthu
2014-03-13 17:58:59
8413*9999

1) 8413-1=8412
2)9999+1=10000-8413=1587

Ans: 84121587 0 0 reply ABDUL MUKEEM
2013-10-10 14:46:20

$758×99999$

to solve these type of question, there are $5$ nines$(9)$ so add zeros with digit as
$75800000$
i added $5$ zeros becoz of $5$ times of nine$(9)$

now subtract digit from it
$75800000-758=75799242$

this is the required ans. 0 0 reply sunitha naidu
2016-02-17 05:21:37
$758(100000-1)=75800000-758=75799242$ 0 0 hari
2013-09-18 09:12:48
$1.~23458×999=\\2.~786×99=$ 0 0 reply SANJAY PAUL
2015-09-15 12:19:30

Just quick trick.
$786×99$

First take last $2$ digit: $86$
$100-86=14$
Write down at right: $14$

Then add $1$ to first digit: $1+7=8$
Then $786-8=778$

Right answer is $77814$ 0 0
123Next
1-10 of 21 comments